WA HB2654 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning certificates of veterinary inspection for animals brought into the state.
Title
Concerning certificates of veterinary inspection for animals brought into the state.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Tom Dent [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-30 | House | AGNR - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
SB6369 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-27 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2654&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2654.pdf |