WA SB6369 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning certificates of veterinary inspection for animals brought into the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning certificates of veterinary inspection for animals brought into the state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateEffective date 6/7/2018.
2018-03-27SenateChapter 281, 2018 Laws.
2018-03-27SenateGovernor signed.
2018-03-06SenateDelivered to Governor.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-03SenatePresident signed.
2018-02-28HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-02-28HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-22HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2018-02-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-21HouseAGNR - Majority; do pass.
2018-02-21HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM.
2018-02-20HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-15HouseFirst reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources
2018-02-13SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2018-02-13SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-12SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-02SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-02-01SenateAWNP - Majority; do pass.
2018-02-01SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-25SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-15SenateFirst reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.

Same As/Similar To

HB2654 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-31 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback