WA HB2620 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-18 - Effective date 7/1/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-18 - Effective date 7/1/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning excise taxation of certain products and services provided or furnished electronically.
Title
Concerning excise taxation of certain products and services provided or furnished electronically.
Sponsors
Rep. Ross Hunter [D] | Rep. Jim Moeller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-18 | Effective date 7/1/2010. | |
2010-03-18 | Chapter 111, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-18 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-05 | President signed. | |
2010-03-05 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-04 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-03-04 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-02 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-18 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-18 | WM - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-17 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-13 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-11 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 1. | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on third reading. | |
2010-02-11 | Committee recommendations adopted and the 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-29 | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-29 | FIN - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-29 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-28 | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-22 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 2:15 PM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Finance. | |
2010-01-08 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6552 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.