WA HB2602 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-05 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 3:30 PM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-05 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 3:30 PM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying certain venue of action provisions.
Title
Modifying certain venue of action provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-05 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB6384 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2602&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2602.pdf |