WA SB6384 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying certain venue of action provisions.
Title
Modifying certain venue of action provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 5:30 PM. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2602 (Crossfiled) 2014-02-05 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 3:30 PM.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6384&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6384.pdf |