WA HB2587 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - Public hearing in the House Appropriations Subcommittee on Education at 10:00 AM.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - Public hearing in the House Appropriations Subcommittee on Education at 10:00 AM.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a tuition and fees exemption for children and surviving spouses of certain highway workers.
Title
Creating a tuition and fees exemption for children and surviving spouses of certain highway workers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Appropriations Subcommittee on Education at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Education. |
2014-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-05 | House | HE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-05 | House | HE - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
SB6370 (Crossfiled) 2014-02-07 - Referred to Ways & Means.