WA HB2578 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Effective date 6/7/2018*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Effective date 6/7/2018*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Preserving and expanding rental housing options for persons whose source of income is derived from or includes sources other than employment.
Title
Preserving and expanding rental housing options for persons whose source of income is derived from or includes sources other than employment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 67 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Effective date 6/7/2018*. |
2018-03-15 | House | Chapter 66, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-15 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 67; nays, 31; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-06 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 36; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | FI - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 9:15 AM. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 8:30 AM. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions & Insurance. |
2018-02-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 61; nays, 37; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-09 | House | Floor amendment |
2018-02-09 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-06 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-06 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-02-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-01 | House | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |