WA HB2540 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the authority of port districts to offer programs relating to air quality improvement equipment and fuel programs that provide emission reductions for engines, vehicles, and vessels.
Title
Clarifying the authority of port districts to offer programs relating to air quality improvement equipment and fuel programs that provide emission reductions for engines, vehicles, and vessels.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-24 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-24 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-24 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2540&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2540.pdf |