WA HB2536 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-23 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-23 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing noncollection of taxes by county treasurers.
Title
Addressing noncollection of taxes by county treasurers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-18 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-18 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |
Same As/Similar To
SB6182 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2536&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2536.pdf |