WA HB2525 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-24 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-24 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning public facilities districts created by at least two city or county legislative authorities.
Title
Concerning public facilities districts created by at least two city or county legislative authorities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-24 | Chapter 192, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-24 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-10 | President signed. | |
2010-03-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-09 | Passed final passage; yeas, 94; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-03-09 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2010-03-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-03-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-05 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2010-03-02 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-01 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-03-01 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-03-01 | WM - Majority; without recommendation. | |
2010-03-01 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-03-01 | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-25 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-25 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-25 | EDTI - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-24 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Trade & Innovation at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-22 | Referred to Economic Development, Trade & Innovation. | |
2010-02-22 | And refer to Economic Development, Trade & Innovation. | |
2010-02-22 | GO - Majority; without recommendation. | |
2010-02-22 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Trade & Innovation at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-18 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-15 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. | |
2010-02-12 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-02-12 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-12 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-01 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-28 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-01-28 | CEDT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-28 | CEDT - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-28 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development & Trade at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-27 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development & Trade at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Community & Economic Development & Trade. | |
2010-01-04 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6262 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.