WA HB2511 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-06 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Providing a benefit increase to certain retirees of the public employees' retirement system plan 1 and the teachers' retirement system plan 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing a benefit increase to certain retirees of the public employees' retirement system plan 1 and the teachers' retirement system plan 1.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-06HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-06HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-06HouseAPP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-02-06HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
2018-01-22HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2018-01-10HouseFirst reading, referred to Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

SB6340 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-15 - First reading, referred to Appropriations

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback