WA HB2484 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning sunshine committee recommendations regarding juveniles.
Title
Concerning sunshine committee recommendations regarding juveniles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2020-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-13 | House | 1st substitute bill not substituted. |
2020-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-04 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-04 | House | SGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-04 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |