WA HB2453 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the reauthorization of the underground storage tank program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the reauthorization of the underground storage tank program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-01HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2018-01-22HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2018-01-18HouseENVI - Majority; do pass.
2018-01-18HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-16HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-15HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-09HouseFirst reading, referred to Environment

Same As/Similar To

SB6159 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback