WA HB2413 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-8)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning property used to facilitate a criminal street gang-related offense.
Title
Concerning property used to facilitate a criminal street gang-related offense.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-14 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2010-12-07 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6784 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2413&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2413.pdf |