WA HB2409 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the sale of water-sewer district real property.
Title
Concerning the sale of water-sewer district real property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-03-01 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-23 | GO - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-22 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-13 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. | |
2010-02-11 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on third reading. | |
2010-02-11 | Committee recommendations adopted and the 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-21 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-18 | LGH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-18 | LGH - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-18 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Local Government & Housing. | |
2010-01-11 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-12-07 | Prefiled for introduction. |