WA HB2408 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning methods of communication used by the technology platform designed for the behavioral health crisis response and suicide prevention system.
Title
Concerning methods of communication used by the technology platform designed for the behavioral health crisis response and suicide prevention system.
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] | Sen. Tina Orwall [D] | Rep. Lauren Davis [D] | Rep. Alex Ramel [D] |
Rep. Greg Nance [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-03 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Health Care & Wellness (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-03 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Health Care & Wellness (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2024-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-12 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-02-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-03 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Health Care & Wellness. |
2024-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2024-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-29 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2024-01-26 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |