WA HB2399 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM.
Pending: House Innovation, Technology & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM.
Pending: House Innovation, Technology & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning connected devices with a voice recognition feature.
Title
Concerning connected devices with a voice recognition feature.
Sponsors
Rep. Zack Hudgins [D] | Rep. Norma Smith [R] | Rep. Luanne Van Werven [R] | Rep. Jesse Young [R] |
Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] | Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-28 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development. |
2020-01-10 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2399&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2399.pdf |