WA HB2363 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning home and community-based services programs for dependents of military service members.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning home and community-based services programs for dependents of military service members.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-02HouseEffective date 6/12/2014.
2014-04-02HouseChapter 180, 2014 Laws.
2014-04-02HouseGovernor signed.
2014-03-12HouseDelivered to Governor.
2014-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2014-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2014-03-10HousePassed final passage; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2014-03-10HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2014-03-04SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2014-03-04SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2014-03-04SenateCommittee amendment adopted with no other amendments.
2014-03-03SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2014-02-28SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2014-02-27SenateHLTH - Majority; do pass with amendment
2014-02-27SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM.
2014-02-25SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM.
2014-02-19SenateFirst reading, referred to Health Care.
2014-02-17HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2014-02-17HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2014-02-17House1st substitute bill substituted
2014-02-07HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2014-01-31HousePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2014-01-30HouseCDHT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2014-01-30HouseCDHT - Executive action taken by committee.
2014-01-30HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM.
2014-01-21HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM.
2014-01-16HouseFirst reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs

Same As/Similar To

SB6351 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-22 - First reading, referred to Health Care.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback