WA HB2361 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Effective date 6/7/2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Effective date 6/7/2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning usage-based automobile insurance.
Title
Concerning usage-based automobile insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage without Senate Amendments (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 38 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 38 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | Effective date 6/7/2012. | |
2012-03-30 | Chapter 222, 2012 Laws. | |
2012-03-30 | Governor signed. | |
2012-03-08 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2012-03-08 | President signed. | |
2012-03-08 | Speaker signed. | |
2012-03-05 | Passed final passage; yeas, 36; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2012-03-05 | Senate receded from amendments. | |
2012-03-03 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments. | |
2012-03-01 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 38; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2012-03-01 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2012-03-01 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2012-02-28 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2012-02-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2012-02-23 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2012-02-23 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2012-02-23 | FIHI - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2012-02-22 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-02-21 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 10:00 AM. | |
2012-02-13 | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance. | |
2012-02-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 73; nays, 23; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2012-02-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-10 | Floor amendment | |
2012-02-10 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2012-02-09 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to Rules 2 Review. | |
2012-01-31 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2012-01-31 | BFS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2012-01-31 | BFS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2012-01-31 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-01-27 | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-01-26 | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 8:00 AM. | |
2012-01-24 | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-01-23 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 6:00 PM. | |
2012-01-12 | First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services. |