WA HB2359 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a certificate of compliance for marijuana business premises that meet the statutory qualifications at the time of application.
Title
Creating a certificate of compliance for marijuana business premises that meet the statutory qualifications at the time of application.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2020-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 84; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-17 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-03 | House | COG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming. |
2020-01-10 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6206 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.