WA HB2358 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-15 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-15 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing liquor license fees limited to fees for beer and/or wine restaurants; taverns; snack bars; combined beer and wine retailers; grocery stores; beer and/or wine specialty shops; passenger trains, vessels, and airplanes; spirits, beer, and wine restaurants; spirits, beer, and wine private clubs; beer and wine private clubs; and public houses.
Title
Increasing liquor license fees limited to fees for beer and/or wine restaurants; taverns; snack bars; combined beer and wine retailers; grocery stores; beer and/or wine specialty shops; passenger trains, vessels, and airplanes; spirits, beer, and wine restaurants; spirits, beer, and wine private clubs; beer and wine private clubs; and public houses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-15 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-05-15 | Chapter 507, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-05-15 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-26 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-26 | President signed. | |
2009-04-25 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-25 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-04-25 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-24 | Placed on second reading. | |
2009-04-24 | Rules suspended. | |
2009-04-24 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2009-04-24 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-04-24 | WM - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-04-24 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-04-23 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2009-04-21 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 50; nays, 47; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-04-21 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-21 | Floor amendment | |
2009-04-20 | Placed on second reading. | |
2009-04-18 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-04-18 | WAYS - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-04-18 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-04-18 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-04-16 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-04-16 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |