WA HB2355 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing the establishment of an individual health insurance market claims-based reinsurance program.
Title
Addressing the establishment of an individual health insurance market claims-based reinsurance program.
Sponsors
Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Joan Mcbride [D] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Sen. June Robinson [D] |
Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2018-01-18 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2018-01-16 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-16 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-09 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
2018-01-03 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6062 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-29 - Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.