WA HB2335 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-19 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning business practices by marijuana retailers that may mislead the public as to the ownership of a retailer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning business practices by marijuana retailers that may mislead the public as to the ownership of a retailer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-22 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-19SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-24SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.
2018-01-22HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2018-01-22HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-01-22House1st substitute bill substituted
2018-01-19HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-01-18HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-01-15HouseCOG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-15HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-08HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-08HouseFirst reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming
2017-12-28HousePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback