WA HB2329 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Effective date 6/7/2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Effective date 6/7/2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Replacing encumbered state forest lands for the benefit of multiple participating counties.
Title
Replacing encumbered state forest lands for the benefit of multiple participating counties.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Bruce Chandler [R] | Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] |
Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Rep. David Taylor [R] | Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | Effective date 6/7/2012. | |
2012-03-29 | Chapter 166, 2012 Laws. | |
2012-03-29 | Governor signed. | |
2012-03-08 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2012-03-08 | President signed. | |
2012-03-08 | Speaker signed. | |
2012-03-05 | Passed final passage; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2012-03-05 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2012-02-24 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2012-02-24 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-24 | Floor amendment | |
2012-02-23 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2012-02-20 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2012-02-17 | ENRM - Majority; do pass. | |
2012-02-16 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources & Marine Waters at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-02-15 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources & Marine Waters at 8:00 AM. | |
2012-02-11 | First reading, referred to Energy, Natural Resources & Marine Waters. | |
2012-02-09 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2012-02-09 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-08 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to Rules 2 Review. | |
2012-01-31 | CB - Majority; do pass. | |
2012-01-31 | CB - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2012-01-31 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. | |
2012-01-24 | Referred to Capital Budget. | |
2012-01-18 | AGNR - Majority; do pass. | |
2012-01-18 | AGNR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2012-01-18 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-01-17 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. | |
2012-01-11 | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6195 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.