WA SB6195 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Replacing encumbered state forest lands for the benefit of multiple participating counties.
Title
Replacing encumbered state forest lands for the benefit of multiple participating counties.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Fraser [D] | Sen. Brian Hatfield [D] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] | Sen. Curtis King [R] |
Sen. Kevin Ranker [D] | Sen. Debbie Regala [D] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] | Sen. Daniel Swecker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-25 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources & Marine Waters at 8:00 AM. | |
2012-01-13 | First reading, referred to Energy, Natural Resources & Marine Waters. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2329 (Crossfiled) 2012-03-29 - Effective date 6/7/2012.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6195&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6195.pdf |