WA HB2316 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM.
Pending: House State Government, Elections & Information Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM.
Pending: House State Government, Elections & Information Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the recording standards commission.
Title
Concerning the recording standards commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Joyce McDonald [R] | Rep. Laurie Dolan [D] | Rep. Drew Stokesbary [R] | Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] |
Rep. Larry Haler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology |
2017-12-22 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6057 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2316&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2316.pdf |