WA SB6057 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the recording standards commission.
Title
Concerning the recording standards commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-15 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-29 | House | First reading, referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2017-12-26 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2316 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-17 - Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM.