WA HB2287 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-7)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a criminal justice system diversion center pilot project.
Title
Establishing a criminal justice system diversion center pilot project.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
2018-02-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-08 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-05 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Public Safety. |
2018-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-23 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-01-18 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |
2017-12-15 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6060 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-01 - Referred to Ways & Means.