WA SB6060 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a criminal justice system diversion center pilot project.
Title
Establishing a criminal justice system diversion center pilot project.
Sponsors
Sen. Guy Palumbo [D] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Barbara Bailey [R] | Sen. John McCoy [D] |
Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | HSC - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 5:45 PM. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2287 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6060&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6060.pdf |