WA HB2285 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a reporting process for the department of natural resources regarding certain marbled murrelet habitat information.
Title
Establishing a reporting process for the department of natural resources regarding certain marbled murrelet habitat information.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Chapman [D] | Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] | Rep. Kristine Lytton [D] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] |
Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | House | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-23 | House | Chapter 255, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 53; nays, 45; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-06 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 35; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
2018-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 54; nays, 43; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-12 | House | Floor amendment |
2018-02-12 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-01-26 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-17 | House | AGNR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2017-12-14 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6020 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-11 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.