WA HB2253 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-09 - Effective date 9/26/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-09 - Effective date 9/26/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amending statutory timelines governing the administration and organization of the joint administrative rules review committee that prescribe when member, alternate, chair, and vice chair appointments and final decisions regarding petitions for review must be made.
Title
Amending statutory timelines governing the administration and organization of the joint administrative rules review committee that prescribe when member, alternate, chair, and vice chair appointments and final decisions regarding petitions for review must be made.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-09 | House | Effective date 9/26/2015. |
2015-07-09 | House | Chapter 11, 2015 Laws 2nd Special Session. |
2015-07-09 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-06-27 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-06-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-06-27 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Held for further consideration. |
2015-06-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 9. |
2015-06-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-06-11 | House | Floor amendment |
2015-06-10 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2015-06-10 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-01 | House | First reading, referred to State Government |