WA HB2230 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subjecting federally recognized Indian tribes to the same conditions as state and local governments for property owned exclusively by the tribe.
Title
Subjecting federally recognized Indian tribes to the same conditions as state and local governments for property owned exclusively by the tribe.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 84 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 83 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 83 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-02 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-04-02 | House | Chapter 272, 2020 Laws. |
2020-04-02 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 84; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2020-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 83; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-28 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-28 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
2019-12-11 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6080 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.