WA HB2208 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing criminal background investigations for current and prospective employees and contractors with access to federal tax information.
Title
Authorizing criminal background investigations for current and prospective employees and contractors with access to federal tax information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | House | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-09 | House | Chapter 19, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-09 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2018-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-23 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-23 | House | SEIT - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-19 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-17 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-05 | House | First reading, referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology |