WA HB2204 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a special liquor permit.
Title
Creating a special liquor permit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | House | Effective date 6/6/2024. |
2024-03-14 | House | Chapter 91, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2024-03-06 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | LC - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2024-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-01-23 | House | RSG - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Regulated Substances & Gaming. |