WA HB2193 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the beneficiaries of the Alaskan Way viaduct project to pay for cost overruns from the project.
Title
Requiring the beneficiaries of the Alaskan Way viaduct project to pay for cost overruns from the project.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] | Rep. Mark Harmsworth [R] | Rep. Matt Shea [R] | Rep. Morgan Irwin [R] |
Rep. Liz Pike [R] | Rep. Jesse Young [R] | Rep. Luanne Van Werven [R] | Rep. Richard Muri [R] |
Rep. Joe Schmick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-03-31 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2193&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2193.pdf |