WA HB2190 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - Effective date 1/1/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - Effective date 1/1/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the electronic submission of vessel reports of sale.
Title
Authorizing the electronic submission of vessel reports of sale.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Harmsworth [R] | Rep. Luis Moscoso [D] | Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] | Rep. Judith Clibborn [D] |
Sen. Lynda Wilson [R] | Rep. Cary Condotta [R] | Rep. Joel Kretz [R] | Rep. Jay Rodne [R] |
Rep. Hans Dunshee [D] | Rep. Liz Pike [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | House | Effective date 1/1/2017. |
2015-04-29 | House | Chapter 148, 2015 Laws. |
2015-04-29 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-04-22 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-16 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2015-03-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-11 | House | Floor amendment |
2015-03-10 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2015-03-09 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |