WA HB2171 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-19 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-19 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing financial aid grants for incarcerated students.
Title
Addressing financial aid grants for incarcerated students.
Sponsors
Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Kevin Waters [R] | Rep. Vandana Slatter [D] | Rep. Tarra Simmons [D] |
Rep. Julia Reed [D] | Rep. Alex Ramel [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Kristine Reeves [D] |
Rep. Lauren Davis [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-16 - House - House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-19 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2024-01-16 | House | PEW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-12 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Postsecondary Education & Workforce. |
2024-01-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |