WA HB2135 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Including federally recognized tribes as part of the Washington emergency management division emergency worker program.
Title
Including federally recognized tribes as part of the Washington emergency management division emergency worker program.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Stearns [D] | Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] | Rep. Julia Reed [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
Rep. Chipalo Street [D] | Sen. Tina Orwall [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Kristine Reeves [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House Committee on Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House Committee on Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | House | Effective date 6/6/2024. |
2024-03-19 | House | Chapter 205, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2024-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-03-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | SGE - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 6:00 PM. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government & Elections. |
2024-02-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-01-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-01-17 | House | ICEV - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans. |
2024-01-04 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 52 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
38 | 52 | 180 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |