WA HB2122 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning sexually violent predators.
Title
Concerning sexually violent predators.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2014-01-24 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2014-01-24 | House | PS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-01-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |
2014-12-12 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5965 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2122&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2122.pdf |