WA HB2107 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the addition of services for long-term placement of mental health patients in community settings that voluntarily contract to provide the services.
Title
Concerning the addition of services for long-term placement of mental health patients in community settings that voluntarily contract to provide the services.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Schmick [R] | Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-22 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | HSC - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Returned to House Rules 3. |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | HSMH - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |
2017-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | House | Committee amendment adopted and floor amendment |
2017-02-24 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-17 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-02-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-15 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |