WA HB2087 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning worker safety on roadways and roadsides.
Title
Concerning worker safety on roadways and roadsides.
Sponsors
Rep. Melanie Stambaugh [R] | Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] | Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] | Rep. Dave Hayes [R] |
Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | House | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-09 | House | Chapter 18, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-09 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | CLS - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports. |
2017-02-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2017-02-27 | House | Placed on third reading. |
2017-02-27 | House | Committee recommendations adopted. |
2017-02-24 | House | Placed on second reading suspension calendar. |
2017-02-24 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-21 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-13 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB5841 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.