WA SB5841 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning worker safety on roadways and roadsides.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning worker safety on roadways and roadsides.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2018-01-26HouseFirst reading, referred to Transportation
2018-01-24SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-01-24SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-01-24SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2018-01-18SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-01-17SenateTRAN - Majority; do pass.
2018-01-17SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2018-01-15SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2018-01-08SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-06-21SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-24SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-02-17SenateFirst reading, referred to Transportation.

Same As/Similar To

HB2087 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-09 - Effective date 6/7/2018.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback