WA HB2077 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Imposing delayed sentencing for offenders with a standard range under one year.
Title
Imposing delayed sentencing for offenders with a standard range under one year.
Sponsors
Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Ruth Kagi [D] | Rep. Steve Kirby [D] |
Rep. Allister O'Brien [D] | Rep. Mary Roberts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-17 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-09 | First reading, referred to Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2077&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2077.pdf |