WA HB2057 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Strengthening diversity, equity, and inclusion in the state patrol workforce.
Title
Strengthening diversity, equity, and inclusion in the state patrol workforce.
Sponsors
Sen. Javier Valdez [D] | Rep. Bill Ramos [D] | Rep. Tana Senn [D] | Rep. Melanie Morgan [D] |
Rep. Jesse Johnson [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 82 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 82 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | House | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-24 | House | Chapter 146, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-24 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-07 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 84; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 36; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2022-02-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 82; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-02-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-08 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-01 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-01 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2022-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2022-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |