WA HB2037 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizing the work group concerned with removing obstacles for higher education students with disabilities.
Title
Reauthorizing the work group concerned with removing obstacles for higher education students with disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Effective date 7/23/2017. |
2017-05-04 | House | Chapter 175, 2017 Laws. |
2017-05-04 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-04-18 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | HIE - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education. |
2017-03-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-07 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-15 | House | HE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-08 | House | First reading, referred to Higher Education |