WA HB2018 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a three-day shop local and save sales and use tax holiday to benefit all Washington families for certain items $1,000 or less during the month of September.
Title
Creating a three-day shop local and save sales and use tax holiday to benefit all Washington families for certain items $1,000 or less during the month of September.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:00 PM. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 5:00 PM. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-04 | House | Floor amendment |
2022-03-04 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-03-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-28 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-28 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM. |
2022-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2022-02-17 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-17 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
82 | 08 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |