WA HB1934 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing an artificial intelligence task force.
Title
Establishing an artificial intelligence task force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-05 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2024-02-20 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-05 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-05 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2024-01-31 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-31 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-01-31 | House | CPB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-26 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
2023-12-13 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5838 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-18 - Effective date 3/18/2024.