WA HB1920 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - Referred to Finance.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - Referred to Finance.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Preserving funding deposited into the education legacy trust account used to support common schools and access to higher education by restoring the application of the Washington estate and transfer tax to certain property transfers.
Title
Preserving funding deposited into the education legacy trust account used to support common schools and access to higher education by restoring the application of the Washington estate and transfer tax to certain property transfers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2014-01-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2013-04-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 54; nays, 42; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2013-04-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-04-16 | House | Floor amendment |
2013-04-15 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-04-08 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-04-08 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2013-04-08 | House | FIN - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-04-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2013-03-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2013-02-18 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |