WA HB1885 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the roles of state and local governments in the regulation and mitigation of water resources.
Title
Clarifying the roles of state and local governments in the regulation and mitigation of water resources.
Sponsors
Rep. Lawrence Springer [D] | Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Matt Manweller [R] |
Rep. Larry Haler [R] | Rep. Richard Muri [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-02-16 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-16 | House | AGNR - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-02 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1885&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1885.pdf |