WA HB1867 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning dual credit program data.
Title
Concerning dual credit program data.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Paul [D] | Rep. April Berg [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] | Sen. Sharon Shewmake [D] |
Rep. Vandana Slatter [D] | Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] | Rep. Monica Stonier [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Committee on Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Committee on Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-17 | House | Chapter 75, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:30 AM. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2022-02-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-02-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-08 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-01 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-28 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
2022-01-07 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28a | 175 | 145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 300 | 560 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 320 | 196 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 600 | 160 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 600 | 280 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 700 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28c | 18 | 162 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |